How smart are you?

Test your brains. Are smart or not?

1 Lets start simple: What is 2 + 2?
2 Little harder now: 12 x 12?
3 Harder: What is 997 + 569?
4 Pretty hard: What is 30 x 12?
5 Are you ready?: ( 9 x 5) + 4 - 30 = ?
6 Very hard: 50 + 11 -12 x 30 + 9 = ?
7 HARDEST OF THEM ALL SO FAR: 81 x 97 + 40 - 1900 + 34 - 19 x 9 =
8 AHHH! HARD!: 56 x 67 x 89 x 10 =?
9 Easy point time... make up for some problems.: 30.00$ + 60.00$ = ?
10 HARDEST OF ALL THE QUESTIONS!: 89 x 37 x 37 + 67 - 2398 x 4 - 11 x 164 = ?